EP0274105 - Slide fastener slider with detachable pull tab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Susumu 16, Ueki Kurobe-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/28] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118876.9 | 18.12.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | JP19860195522U | 19.12.1986 Original published format: JP 19552286 U | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274105 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274105 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/26, // A44B19/30 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
A44B19/26 (EP,KR,US);
A44B19/30 (KR);
A44B19/301 (EP,US);
A44B19/308 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2568 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2586 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/28] | Title | German: | Reissverschlussschieber mit abnehmbarer Zuglasche | [1988/28] | English: | Slide fastener slider with detachable pull tab | [1988/28] | French: | Curseur de fermeture à glissière muni d'une tirette amovible | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0178585 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]FR2272621 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]GB1368778 (LIGHTNING FASTENERS LTD); | [A]US2234939 (HATCH RICHARD A); | [A]GB558151 (ERIC HILEY MARLOW, et al); | [A]DE2748546 (COATS LTD J & P) |