Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] |
06.12.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 23.01.1991 [1991/04] |
13.10.1989 | Change - applicant | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] |
13.10.1989 | Change - representative | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] |
14.12.1988 | Change - representative | published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
24.09.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |