Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0289662 | Global Dossier | 23.01.1991 | A3 | EP0289662 | 09.11.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4511387 | 04.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1288621 | 10.09.1991 | C | Priority number | Date | US4511387 | 04.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63275759 | 14.11.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US4511387 | 04.05.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4729278 | 08.03.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US4511387 | 04.05.1987 |