EP0278101 - Hay making machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREENLAND GMBH & CO. KG Erwin-Dietrich-Platz 1 D-78244 Gottmadingen / DE | [1989/41] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wessel, Ulrich Hilzingerstrasse 33 D-7702 Gottmadingen / DE | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/41] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118989.0 | 21.12.1987 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | DE19873704082 | 10.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3704082 | [1988/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278101 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01D80/02, A01B23/02 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
A01D80/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1988/33] | Title | German: | Heuwerbungsmaschine | [1988/33] | English: | Hay making machine | [1988/33] | French: | Machine de fenaison | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/07] | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/11] | 26.10.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT192170B [ ]; | DE1186256 [ ]; | EP0097801 [ ]; | CH341021 [ ] |