EP0322470 - Device for measuring thread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARCO AUTOMATION, NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP Frankrijklaan 18 B-8970 Poperinge / BE | For all designated states W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO. Blumenberger Strasse 143-145 41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states BARCO AUTOMATION, NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP Frankrijklaan 18 B-8970 Poperinge / BE | ||
For all designated states W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO. Blumenberger Strasse 143-145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | |||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states BARCO AUTOMATION, NAAMLOZE VENNOOTSCHAP Frankrijklaan 18 B-8970 Poperinge / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Liefde, Yvan Oudenhovestraat 14 B-8620 Zottegem / BE | 02 /
De Vuyst, Marcel Wolstraat 9 B-8790 Waregem / BE | 03 /
Goetsches, Peter Bolksbuscher Strasse 87 D-4050 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Möhrke, Dieter Katzbachstrasse 27 45472 Mülheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Möhrke, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Katzbachstrasse 27 D-45472 Mülheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119212.6 | 24.12.1987 | [1989/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322470 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322470 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/10, B65H63/06, D01H13/32 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G01B11/105 (EP,US);
B65H63/065 (EP,US);
D01H13/32 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Messen eines Fadens | [1989/27] | English: | Device for measuring thread | [1989/27] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer un fil | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.12.1991 | GB | 04.12.1991 | IT | 04.12.1991 | NL | 04.12.1991 | SE | 04.12.1991 | AT | 31.12.1991 | LU | 31.12.1991 | FR | 24.04.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 04.12.1991 | |
GB | 04.12.1991 | ||
IT | 04.12.1991 | ||
NL | 04.12.1991 | ||
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
LU | 31.12.1991 | ||
FR | 24.04.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.12.1991 | |
GB | 04.12.1991 | ||
IT | 04.12.1991 | ||
NL | 04.12.1991 | ||
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
FR | 24.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/34] | BE | 04.12.1991 | |
GB | 04.12.1991 | ||
NL | 04.12.1991 | ||
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
FR | 24.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 04.12.1991 | |
GB | 04.12.1991 | ||
NL | 04.12.1991 | ||
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
FR | 24.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/45] | BE | 04.12.1991 | |
NL | 04.12.1991 | ||
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
FR | 24.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 04.12.1991 | |
NL | 04.12.1991 | ||
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | NL | 04.12.1991 | |
SE | 04.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 04.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1048050 (GUETERMANN & CO); | [X]FR1281486 (LOEPFE AG GEB); | [X]GB994917 (JOHN HALLIDAY AND SONS LTD); | [X]FR1463560 ; | [A]US3401267 (ENGLE MILTON A, et al); | [X]US3582661 (PIJLS HERMANUS STEPHANUS JOSEP); | [A]US3712743 (HARRIS J, et al); | [A]US3840869 (PUGH C); | [X]WO8401622 (AICHI SPINNING CO [JP]) |