EP0273424 - Aromatic polyesters and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki City, Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City Okayama Prefecture 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Mitsuo 1505-9, Mizue Kurashiki-city Okayama-Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kaneda, Teruhisa C-202, 2-5, Dairyo Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-city Osaka-pref. / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119254.8 | 28.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | JP19860310918 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: JP 31091886 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273424 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273424 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/66, C08L67/00, C08K3/00, H01B3/42 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
C08G63/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/27] | Title | German: | Aromatische Polyester und ihre Anwendung | [1988/27] | English: | Aromatic polyesters and their use | [1988/27] | French: | Polyesters aromatiques et leur utilisation | [1988/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/21] | 22.12.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.01.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0237358 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP0026991 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0019242 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0033147 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0092843 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0199020 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |