EP0276479 - Mushroom mycelium-containing fertilizer, and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grabbe, Klaus, Dr. Tiergarten 24 D-38116 Braunschweig / DE | For all designated states Nille, Bernd, Dr. Salzdahlumer Strasse 128 d D-3340 WolfenbÜttel / DE | [1988/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/31] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER, Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119258.9 | 28.12.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | DE19863644671 | 30.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3644671 | [1988/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276479 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C05F11/00, C05F3/00 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
C05F11/08 (EP);
C05F3/00 (EP);
C05F5/008 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C05F3/00, C05F5/008, C05F11/00 (EP);
C05F3/00, C05F5/00, C05F11/00 (EP);
C05F5/008, C05F11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GR [1988/31] | Title | German: | Düngemittel mit einem Gehalt an Pilzmyzel sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung des Düngemittels | [1988/31] | English: | Mushroom mycelium-containing fertilizer, and process for producing the same | [1988/31] | French: | Engrais contenant du mycélium de champignon et son procédé de préparation | [1988/31] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/13: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 88900954.4/0303632 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 13.02.90 | EPB 1990/13: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 88900954.4/0303632 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 13.02.90 | EPB 1990/13: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 88900954.4/0303632 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 13.02.90 | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 03.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 11.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE505453 ; | [Y]US2337686 (EDWARD SHERMAN ALEC); | [YD]DE2831583 (GRABBE KLAUS); | [Y]DD139083 (OLESCH BERND, et al); | [YD]DE3024737 (GRABBE KLAUS); | [Y]EP0060407 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0121493 (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 72, Nr. 13, 30. März 1970, Seite 300, Zusammenfassung Nr. 65996k, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.S. BAWASKAR: "Chemical composition of dungs and some organic waste materials" |