EP0273432 - 2-Nitro-5-(substituted phenoxy) benzohydroximate derivatives and their use as herbicide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goh, Atsushi 1977-7, Kosaka-machi Ushiku-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Endo, Keiji 1-11-5-203, Chuo Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yuri 1-11-5-204, Chuo Ami-machi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119275.3 | 28.12.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | JP19860315443 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: JP 31544386 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273432 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273432 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C131/105, C07C153/017, A01N37/52 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
A01N37/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/27] | Title | German: | 2-Nitro-5-(substituierte phenoxy)benzohydroximsäureester und ihre Verwendung als Herbizide | [1988/27] | English: | 2-Nitro-5-(substituted phenoxy) benzohydroximate derivatives and their use as herbicide | [1988/27] | French: | Dérivés de 2-nitro-5-(phénoxy substitué)benzohydroximate et leur utilisation comme herbicide | [1988/27] | File destroyed: | 27.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/16] | 22.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.09.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0155613 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) |