Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] |
18.07.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] |
30.11.1990 | First examination report | |
18.11.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.01.1989 [1989/01] |
21.05.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] |