EP0231969 - Mobile X-ray diagnostic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/33] | Mobile X-ray image intensifier | ||
[1991/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cobben, Johannes Ignatius Marie c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Zwaan, Andries Willem, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1993/09] |
Former [1987/33] | Scheele, Edial François INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200110.2 | 26.01.1987 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | NL19860000227 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: NL 8600227 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231969 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231969 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B6/10 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
A61B6/4441 (EP);
A61B6/10 (EP);
A61B6/4405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/33] | Title | German: | Fahrbares Röntgen-Untersuchungsgeraet | [1991/47] | English: | Mobile X-ray diagnostic apparatus | [1991/47] | French: | Appareil de radiodiagnostic mobile | [1991/47] |
Former [1987/33] | Fahrbarer Röntgen-Bildverstärker | ||
Former [1987/33] | Mobile X-ray image intensifier | ||
Former [1987/33] | Intensificateur d'images radiologiques à équipage mobile | Examination procedure | 04.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 25.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.08.1992 | [1993/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH213139 ; | [YP]DE3439968 ; | [A]EP0068931 ; | [A]EP0109206 ; | [A]US3549885 ; | [A]DE1939557 ; | [A]DE1213565 |