EP0234631 - Hydromotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO CAR B.V. Steenovenweg 1 5708 HN Helmond / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states Volvo Car B.V. Steenovenweg 1 NL-5708 HN Helmond / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cadée, Theodorus Petrus Maria Pastoor de Beeckstraat 11 NL 5051 TJ Goirle / NL | [1989/39] |
Former [1987/36] | 01 /
Cadée, Theodorus Petrus Maria Pastoor de Beeckstraat 11 NL 5051 TJ Goirle / NE | Representative(s) | Timmermans, Anthonius C.Th., et al Octrooibureau Zuid, Bureau voor Merken en Modellen B.V., Postbus 4582 5601 EN Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Timmermans, Anthonius C.Th., Ir., et al European Patent Attorneys Octrooibureau Zuid P.O. Box 2287 NL-5600 CG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1987/36] | Timmermans, Anthonius C.Th., Ir. European Patent Attorneys Octrooibureau Zuid P.O. Box 2287 NL-5600 CG Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200182.1 | 07.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | NL19860000353 | 13.02.1986 Original published format: NL 8600353 | [1987/36] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0234631 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234631 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16H39/14, F16D31/02 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
F16D31/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Motor | [1987/36] | English: | Hydromotor | [1987/36] | French: | Moteur hydraulique | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 12.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB135799 (HELE-SHAW HENRY SELBY [GB]); | [A]FR508434 (GNOME ET RHONE MOTEURS); | [A]US1995646 (WATSON PATERSON THOMAS); | [A]GB935145 (KOPAT GES FUR KONSTRUKTION ENT); | [A]FR2101963 (MULLER THEODORE); | [A]DE3040928 (WEGERDT FRITZ [DE], et al); | [A]DE3139191 (BENDER NIKOLAUS MATTHIAS) |