EP0238131 - Lactam polymerization initiators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM RIM NYLON V.O.F Karveelweg 3 NL-6222 NJ Maastricht / NL | [1987/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mottus, Edward H. 850 Claymont Drive Ballwin Missouri 63011 / US | 02 /
Hedrick, Ross M. 300 Chasselle Lane St. Louis Missouri 63141 / US | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200426.2 | 09.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | US19860838643 | 11.03.1986 Original published format: US 838643 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238131 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238131 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/20, C07D207/27, C07D223/10 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
C08G69/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/39] | Title | German: | Initiatoren für die Lactampolymerisation | [1987/39] | English: | Lactam polymerization initiators | [1987/39] | French: | Initiateur de polymérisation de lactame | [1987/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/50] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3206418 (GIBERSON JOHN W); | [AD]US4031164 (HEDRICK ROSS MELVIN, et al); | [A]US3440227 (BAUM BERNARD O) |