EP0247645 - Closure for a container with a pouring opening closed by a membrane fixed by induction or conduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LYNES HOLDING S.A. 37, rue Notre-Dame L-1528 Luxembourg / LU | [1987/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debetencourt, Jean Les Altières 5 B-7535 Maulde / BE | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 87200541.8 | 25.03.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | BE19860216725 | 30.05.1986 Original published format: BE 216725 | [1987/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247645 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247645 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/22 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
B65D51/225 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/49] | Title | German: | Verschluss fur einen Behälter, dessen Öffnung durch eine, durch Induktion oder Konduktion befestigte Membrane geschlossen ist | [1987/49] | English: | Closure for a container with a pouring opening closed by a membrane fixed by induction or conduction | [1987/49] | French: | Bouchon destiné à l'obturation d'un récipient dont l'orifice est obturé par un opercule solidarisé de celui-ci par induction ou conduction | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 17.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.1990 | GR | 06.06.1990 | SE | 06.06.1990 | [2000/04] |
Former [1991/29] | AT | 06.06.1990 | |
SE | 06.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | SE | 06.06.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2066390 (CAHOON BRENT F, et al); | [Y]FR83084E ; | [Y]FR90028E ; | [Y]FR2049485 (TARD FRANCOIS, et al); | [X]GB2127387 (SUNBEAM PLASTICS CORP) |