EP0241079 - Method and apparatus for electroplating a metallic deposit on interconnected metallic components and/or metallized products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meco Equipment Engineers B.V. De Beverspijken 3 P.O. Box 2214 NL-5202 CE 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [1987/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meuldijk, Pieter Willem Loyolalaan 62 NL-5263 AV Vught / NL | 02 /
Hoyer, Willem Henri Nicolaas Achterstraat 9 NL-5221 Den-Bosch / NL | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2009/49] |
Former [1992/21] | Vollebregt, Cornelis Jacobus, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau World Trade Center P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1987/42] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir. P. Petersstraat 160, P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200575.6 | 26.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | NL19860000838 | 02.04.1986 Original published format: NL 8600838 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241079 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241079 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02, C25D7/06 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C25D7/0678 (EP,US);
C25D5/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Plattierung mit einer metallischen Schicht auf miteinander verbundenen metallischen Komponenten und/oder metallisierten Produkten | [1987/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for electroplating a metallic deposit on interconnected metallic components and/or metallized products | [1987/42] | French: | Procédé et appareillage d'électroplacage d'un dépôt métallique sur des composants métalliques et/ou des objets métallisés reliés entre eux | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/50] | 14.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.1991 | BE | 11.09.1991 | CH | 11.09.1991 | GR | 11.09.1991 | IT | 11.09.1991 | LI | 11.09.1991 | SE | 11.09.1991 | ES | 22.12.1991 | LU | 31.03.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 11.09.1991 | ||
GR | 11.09.1991 | ||
IT | 11.09.1991 | ||
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
ES | 22.12.1991 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 11.09.1991 | ||
GR | 11.09.1991 | ||
IT | 11.09.1991 | ||
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 11.09.1991 | ||
IT | 11.09.1991 | ||
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
LU | 31.03.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 11.09.1991 | ||
IT | 11.09.1991 | ||
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/36] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
BE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 11.09.1991 | ||
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
CH | 11.09.1991 | ||
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/20] | CH | 11.09.1991 | |
LI | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/12] | CH | 11.09.1991 | |
LI | 11.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4374004 (SALAMA AMIR [CA]); | [A]US4376017 (URION KENDALL D); | [A]US4405410 (SEBASTIEN LESLIE [CA]); | [X]EP0107417 (OWEN S G LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0159471 (MECO EQUIP ENG [NL]) |