EP0240083 - Colourless ketimines, their preparation and their use as cross-linking agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartels, Tamme Touwslagersdreef 47 NL-4691 LW Tholen / NL | 02 /
Pilaszek, Wincenty Lambertus Stanislaw Garnalenstraat 94 NL-4691 KL Tholen / NL | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200585.5 | 27.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | NL19860000847 | 03.04.1986 Original published format: NL 8600847 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240083 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240083 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240083 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C251/08, C09D163/00, C09J163/00 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
C08K5/29 (EP,US);
C08G59/182 (EP,US);
C08G59/4042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/41] | C07C119/12, C09D3/49, C09J3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Farblose Ketimine, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Vernetzungsmittel | [1987/41] | English: | Colourless ketimines, their preparation and their use as cross-linking agents | [1987/41] | French: | Cétimines incolores, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme agent réticulant | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 70, no. 9, 3rd March 1969, page 352, abstract no. 37766a, Columbus, Ohio, US; W. POEPEL et al.: "Condensation of 1,3-diaminopropane derivatives with aldehydes and ketones", & J. PRAKT. CHEM. 1968, 38 (5-6), 339-57 |