EP0243996 - Process for the preparation of a silver-containing catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boxhoorn, Gosse Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Klazinga, Jan Hendrik Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Velthuis, Otto Mente Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/09] |
Former [1991/38] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1987/45] | Aalbers, Onno P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200607.7 | 30.03.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | GB19860010441 | 29.04.1986 Original published format: GB 8610441 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243996 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243996 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243996 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/66, C07D301/10 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
C07D301/10 (EP,US);
B01J23/50 (KR);
B01J23/66 (EP,US);
B01J27/138 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Silber enthaltenden Katalysators | [1987/45] | English: | Process for the preparation of a silver-containing catalyst | [1987/45] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un catalyseur contenant de l'argent | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 21.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB1413251 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [Y]EP0096130 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [A]EP0168782 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |