EP0244909 - High-pressure sodium vapour discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antonis, Petrus Hendrikus c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Meessen, Lodewijk Hubert Maria c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Schäfer, Ralf c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200808.1 | 29.04.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | NL19860001162 | 07.05.1986 Original published format: NL 8601162 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244909 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244909 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/82 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
H01J61/825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/46] | Title | German: | Hochdrucknatriumdampfentladungslampe | [1987/46] | English: | High-pressure sodium vapour discharge lamp | [1987/46] | French: | Lampe à décharge à vapeur de sodium à haute pression | [1987/46] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5826449 ; | [AD]GB2083281 (PHILIPS NV); | [AD]EP0094137 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 103 (E-173)[1248], 6th May 1983; & JP-A-58 26 449 (MATSUSHITA DENSHI KOGYO K.K.) 16-02-1983, & JP5826449 A 00000000 |