EP0244917 - Organic solvent soluble polyvalent metal alkoxy alkoxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.06.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states STAUFFER CHEMICAL COMPANY Westport Connecticut 06880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Summers, III, William 105 N.Division Street Peekskill New York 10566 / US | 02 /
Burkhardt, Eric William 46 Juniper Circle Brewster New York 10509 / US | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1990/10] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Patents Department P.O. Box 93 00 Velperweg 76 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1987/46] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200842.0 | 08.05.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | US19860861392 | 09.05.1986 Original published format: US 861392 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244917 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/70, C07C41/26, C07C43/13, C07F3/00, C07F3/02, C07F3/04, C07F5/00 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
C07C43/13 (EP,US);
C07F3/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/46] | Title | German: | Mehrwertigemetallalkoxyalkoholate löslich in organischen Lösungsmitteln | [1987/46] | English: | Organic solvent soluble polyvalent metal alkoxy alkoxides | [1987/46] | French: | Alcoxyalcoolates de métaux polyvalents, solubles dans des solvants organiques | [1987/46] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 04.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 20.11.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/33] | 23.03.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2112644 (NAT PATENT DEV CORP); | [X]DD79486 ; | [X]US3285968 (BRADLEY WILLIAM R); | [A]DE2338972 (NAT PATENT DEV CORP); | [A]GB2040286 (ANIC SPA); | [A]WO8502176 (LITHIUM CORP [US]) |