EP0292617 - Connecting device for securing a girder to a column at a chosen level [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Middendorp, Cornelis Johannes Jacobus Zuidweg 33c NL-2671 MN Naaldwijk / NL | [1988/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200997.2 | 27.05.1987 | [1988/48] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292617 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292617 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
E04G7/18 (EP);
E04H17/12 (EP);
F16B7/0493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | Verbindungselement zum Festlegen eines Trägers auf einer Säule in einer gewählten Höhe | [1988/48] | English: | Connecting device for securing a girder to a column at a chosen level | [1988/48] | French: | Dispositif de connexion pour fixer une traverse à une colonne à une hauteur choisie | [1988/48] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 14.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2533417 ; | [A]DE3438521 ; | [A]CH340675 ; | [A]FR2311954 ; | [A]US2523785 ; | [A]US3108828 |