EP0250020 - Prefabricated reinforced concrete self-bearing roofing elements for building construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/52] | Improvements to prefabricated reinforced concrete self-bearing roofing elements for building construction | ||
[1990/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DLC S.r.L. Via Tiziano, 19 I-20145 Milano / IT | [1987/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dal Lago, Alberto Corso Plebisciti 9 I-20129 Milano / IT | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | Martegani, Franco, et al Ingg. GUZZI e RAVIZZA S.r.l. Via Boccaccio, 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Martegani, Franco, et al Ingg. GUZZI e RAVIZZA S.r.l. Via Boccaccio, 24 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87201005.3 | 29.05.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | IT19860020868 | 20.06.1986 Original published format: IT 2086886 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0250020 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0250020 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250020 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/10, E04B7/12, E04D13/16 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
E04B7/12 (EP);
E04B7/107 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/52] | E04B7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Vorgefertigte, selbsttragende Dachelemente aus Beton für Gebäude | [1987/52] | English: | Prefabricated reinforced concrete self-bearing roofing elements for building construction | [1990/30] | French: | Eléments de toit autoportants, préfabriqués en béton, pour la construction d'édifices | [1987/52] |
Former [1987/52] | Improvements to prefabricated reinforced concrete self-bearing roofing elements for building construction | Examination procedure | 10.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 23.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.1990 | BE | 25.07.1990 | GR | 25.07.1990 | NL | 25.07.1990 | SE | 25.07.1990 | [2000/04] |
Former [1991/34] | AT | 25.07.1990 | |
BE | 25.07.1990 | ||
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | AT | 25.07.1990 | |
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 25.07.1990 | |
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 25.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1091308 (GEILINGER & CO); | [A]DE1919200 (ZUEBLIN AG); | [A]FR2073630 (BAUTYPEN AG); | [A]DE1658973 (SILBERKUHL WILHELM JOHANNES DI); | [A]DE2336603 (MENOSSO ENNIO); | [A]FR2551123 (MARLEY TILE AG [CH]) |