EP0250030 - Telephone set comprising a line voltage stabilizer having a DC supply point [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Dongen, Frederik c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Sijbers, Peter Johannes Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/52] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201099.6 | 11.06.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | NL19860001548 | 16.06.1986 Original published format: NL 8601548 | [1987/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250030 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250030 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/76 | [1987/52] | CPC: |
H04M19/08 (EP,US);
H04M1/76 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/52] | Title | German: | Fernsprecher, versehen mit einem Linienspannungsstabilisator mit Gleichstromspeisung | [1987/52] | English: | Telephone set comprising a line voltage stabilizer having a DC supply point | [1987/52] | French: | Appareil téléphonique comportant un stabilisateur de tension de ligne alimenté en courant continu | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.05.1991 | [1992/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0154366 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [AD] - PHILIPS LABORATORY REPORT, ETT 8506, 30th September 1985, pages R0-R38, Eindhoven, NL; F.v. DONGEN: "Application of the transmission circuit TEA1060 and the supply circuit TEA1080" | [A] - NEW ELECTRONICS, no. 8, 16th April 1985, pages 145,147,149, London, GB; G.A. MULLARD: "Designing a versatile telephone set - part II" |