EP0255155 - A seed drill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Lely, Ary 10A Weverskade Maasland / NL | 02 /
Bom, Cornelis J. G. 16 Laan van Nieuw Rozenburg Rozenburg / NL | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | Mulder, Herman, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201103.6 | 11.06.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | NL19860001529 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: NL 8601529 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255155 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255155 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255155 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/08, A01C15/00, A01B73/00 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
A01B73/00 (EP);
A01C15/005 (EP);
A01C15/006 (EP);
A01C7/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1988/05] | Title | German: | Sämaschine | [1988/05] | English: | A seed drill | [1988/05] | French: | Semoir | [1988/05] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/01: Teilanmeldung 92201719.9 eingereicht am 11/06/87 | EPB 1993/01: Divisional application 92201719.9 filed on 11/06/87 | EPB 1993/01: Demande divisionnaire 92201719.9 déposée le 11/06/87 | Examination procedure | 03.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 01.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92201719.9 / EP0506210 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1554609 ; | [Y]GB752161 ; | [A]DE2447982 | Examination | FR2375813 |