EP0253423 - Method of driving a display device and a display suitable for such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuijk, Karel Elbert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201206.7 | 24.06.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | NL19860001804 | 10.07.1986 Original published format: NL 8601804 | [1988/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0253423 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0253423 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
G09G3/367 (EP,US);
G09F9/35 (KR);
G09G3/3607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern eines Anzeigegerätes und Anzeigegerät, geeignet für ein solches Verfahren | [1988/03] | English: | Method of driving a display device and a display suitable for such a method | [1988/03] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un dispositif d'affichage et dispositif d'affichage convenant à une telle méthode | [1988/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.05.1992 | LI | 13.05.1992 | NL | 13.05.1992 | SE | 13.05.1992 | [1993/01] |
Former [1992/52] | CH | 13.05.1992 | |
LI | 13.05.1992 | ||
SE | 13.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/49] | CH | 13.05.1992 | |
LI | 13.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0090888 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]); | [A]FR2569293 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) | Examination | US4223308 | GB1390925 |