EP0254340 - Piston for a piston machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOLBENSCHMIDT Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 13 51 D-74150 Neckarsulm / DE | [1988/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steidle, Werner Zehn Morgen 10 D-7107 Bad Friedrichshall 2 / DE | 02 /
Mielke, Siegfried, Dr. Mergentheimer Strasse 8 D-7107 Neckarsulm / DE | 03 /
Schrezenmeier, Kurt Fichtenweg 6 D-7107 Neckarsulm / DE | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Rieger, Harald Reuterweg 14 60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1988/04] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 87201256.2 | 01.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | DE19863625059 | 24.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3625059 | [1988/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0254340 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0254340 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16J1/16 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
F16J1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/04] | Title | German: | Kolben für Kolbenmaschinen | [1988/04] | English: | Piston for a piston machine | [1988/04] | French: | Piston pour une machine à pistons | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 01.09.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3357318 ; | [A]FR2157319 ; | [A]FR2126711 ; | [A]EP0065642 |