EP0252568 - New organofluorine compounds and a biochemical process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schofield, John Anthony The Old Farm House Buckland Teynham Sittingbourne Kent / GB | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/04] |
Former [1989/42] | Bennett, David Arthur Horder, et al 4, York Road London SE1 7NA / GB | ||
Former [1988/02] | Hunter, Keith Roger Ian Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, Intellectual Property Division, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87201288.5 | 07.07.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | GB19860016614 | 08.07.1986 Original published format: GB 8616614 | [1988/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0252568 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0252568 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252568 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C35/14, C12P7/02 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
C07C35/14 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12P7/02 (EP);
C12R2001/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Organofluorverbindungen und ihr biochemisches Herstellungsverfahren | [1988/02] | English: | New organofluorine compounds and a biochemical process for their preparation | [1988/02] | French: | Composés organofluorés et leur procédé biochimique de préparation | [1988/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 06.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.01.1993 | IT | 27.01.1993 | SE | 27.01.1993 | ES | 08.05.1993 | LU | 31.07.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 27.01.1993 | |
IT | 27.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
LU | 31.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.01.1993 | |
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/32] | SE | 27.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0076606 ; | [E]EP0252567 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [E]EP0253485 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [E]GB2199324 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) |