EP0256578 - Method of severing an annular core of a ferromagnetic material for a deflection unit and deflection unit for a television tube comprising an annular core severed according to such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/08] | Method of severing an annular core of a ferromagnetic material for a deflection unit and deflection unit for a television tube comprising and annular core severed according to such a method | ||
[1992/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elders, Marius Joseph Int. Octrooibureau B.V Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Abbringh, Frederik Jan Georg Int. Octrooibureau B.V Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1988/08] | Auwerda, Cornelis Petrus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201389.1 | 21.07.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | NL19860002006 | 06.08.1986 Original published format: NL 8602006 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256578 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256578 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/76, H01J9/236, B23K26/00 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
H01J9/236 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Brechen eines ferromagnetischen ringförmigen Kernes für eine Ablenkeinheit und mit einem solchen Kern ausgestattete Fernsehablenkeinheit | [1988/08] | English: | Method of severing an annular core of a ferromagnetic material for a deflection unit and deflection unit for a television tube comprising an annular core severed according to such a method | [1992/14] | French: | Méthode pour casser un noyau annulaire en matériau ferromagnétique pour une unité de déflexion et unité de déflexion pour un tube de télévision comportant un tel noyau | [1988/08] |
Former [1988/08] | Method of severing an annular core of a ferromagnetic material for a deflection unit and deflection unit for a television tube comprising and annular core severed according to such a method | Examination procedure | 19.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 23.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.04.1992 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1224980 (MULLARD LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0059003 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]FR2566691 (BRANDT ARMEMENTS [FR]) | [ ] - LASER UND OPTOELECTRONIK, vol. 17, no. 4, December 1985, pages 397-408, Stuttgart, DE; H.-G TREUSCH et al.: "Bohren mit gepulsten Nd: YAG-Lasersystemen. Drilling by pulsed Nd: YAG-Lasers" |