EP0255976 - Formation fluid sampler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/07] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pritchard, JR., John Jefferson 3700 Dulaney Drive Harvey Louisiana 70058 / US | [1988/07] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J., et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Zeestraten, Albertus Wilhelmus Joannes, et al Shell International B.V. P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1988/07] | Aalbers, Onno P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201449.3 | 28.07.1987 | [1988/07] | Priority number, date | US19860890433 | 29.07.1986 Original published format: US 890433 | [1988/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255976 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255976 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/08, E21B33/124, E21B43/116, E21B47/06 | [1988/07] | CPC: |
E21B49/081 (EP,US);
E21B43/116 (EP,US);
E21B47/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Probennahme von Formationsflüssigkeit | [1988/07] | English: | Formation fluid sampler | [1988/07] | French: | Echantillonneur pour fluide de formation | [1988/07] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3087549 (BRUNTON ARTHUR F); | [A]US3273659 (REYNOLDS JR FRANCOIS H K); | [A]US3327781 (NUTTER BENJAMIN P); | [A]US3384170 (POOLLEN HENDRIK K VAN); | [A]US3455904 (HOPKIN EDMUND A) |