EP0251419 - Fuel composition and additive concentrates, and their use in inhibiting engine coking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION Ethyl Tower 451 Florida Boulevard Baton Rouge Louisiana 70801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION Ethyl Tower 451 Florida Boulevard Baton Rouge Louisiana 70801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanlon, John Vincent 2610 Bopp Road St. Louis Missouri 63131 / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87201461.8 | 28.12.1984 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | US19830567089 | 30.12.1983 Original published format: US 567089 | US19830567071 | 30.12.1983 Original published format: US 567071 | US19830567090 | 30.12.1983 Original published format: US 567090 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0251419 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251419 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C10L10/02 (EP);
C10L1/22 (EP);
C10L10/04 (EP);
C10L1/222 (EP);
C10L1/2222 (EP);
C10L1/2283 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzusammensetzung und Zusatzkonzentrate und deren Verwendung zur Motorschlamminhibierung | [1988/01] | English: | Fuel composition and additive concentrates, and their use in inhibiting engine coking | [1988/01] | French: | Composition combustible et concentrés d'additifs, et leurs utilisations pour inhiber la formation de dépôts dans un moteur | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84309143.0 / EP0147240 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.01.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3717446 [ ]; | US3701641 [ ]; | US2768884 [ ]; | DE1232392 [ ] |