EP0257686 - Herbicides and fungicides containing activity promoting additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hulshof, Willem Taede Mennestraat 8 NL-3882 AN Putten / NL | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1988/09] | Sieders, René AKZO N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 87201495.6 | 06.08.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | NL19860002115 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: NL 8602115 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257686 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257686 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/30 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
A01N25/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Herbizide und Fungizide, die wirkungserhöhende Zusätze enthalten | [1988/09] | English: | Herbicides and fungicides containing activity promoting additives | [1988/09] | French: | Herbicides et fongicides contenant des additifs augmentant l'activité | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.02.1991 | GR | 06.02.1991 | SE | 06.02.1991 | LU | 31.08.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 06.02.1991 | |
SE | 06.02.1991 | ||
LU | 31.08.1991 | ||
Former [1991/49] | AT | 06.02.1991 | |
SE | 06.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/39] | SE | 06.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3110732 (SPERANZA GEORGE P, et al); | [A]US3121750 (DE GROOTE MELVIN, et al); | [AD]GB998264 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4075002 (DREWE NIGEL WYNDHAM, et al); | [A]GB2022416 (KATAYAMA CHEMICAL WORKS CO, et al); | [A]EP0006348 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]); | [A]JPS6075324 (NEOS KK) |