EP0263543 - Process for producing a single crystal of a III-V semiconducting compound using the Czochralski method by liquid encapsulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1988/15] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farges, Jean-Pierre Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian, et al Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Landousy, Christian, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87201649.8 | 31.08.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | FR19860012481 | 05.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8612481 | [1988/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263543 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/00, C30B27/02, C30B29/40 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
C30B15/00 (EP);
C30B29/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Einskristalls aus einer Verbindung eines Halbleitermaterials der Gruppen III-V nach der Czochralski-Methode mit flüssiger Hüllschicht | [1988/15] | English: | Process for producing a single crystal of a III-V semiconducting compound using the Czochralski method by liquid encapsulation | [1988/15] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un monocristal d'un composé semiconducteur du groupe III-V, par la méthode de tirage czochralski par encapsulation liquide | [1988/15] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 28.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/35] | 01.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 66, no. 2, avril 1984, pages 317-326, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., (North-Holland Physics Publishing Division), Amsterdam, NL; P.J. ROKSNOER et al.: "The single crystal growth and characterization of indium phospide" | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 66, no. 2, avril 1984, pages 327-332, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., (North-Holland Physics Publishing Division), Amsterdam, NL; D-F. FANG et al.: "Growth and properties of InP single crystals" | [A] - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 52, 2e partie, 1981, pages 591-596, North-Holland Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; C. UEMURA et al.: "LEC growth and characterization of undoped InP crystals" |