EP0260761 - Liquid chromatograph apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitehead, Martin Alan c/o Pye Unicam Limited York Street Cambridge CB1 2PX / GB | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1988/12] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87201759.5 | 15.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | GB19860022328 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: GB 8622328 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260761 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260761 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/32, G01N30/36 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
G01N30/34 (EP,US);
G01N30/36 (EP,US);
G01N2030/322 (EP,US);
G01N2030/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | Apparat für die Flüssigkeitschromatographie | [1988/12] | English: | Liquid chromatograph apparatus | [1988/12] | French: | Appareil de chromatographie en liquides | [1988/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8517883U ; | [Y]US4222414 (ACHENER PIERRE Y); | [A]EP0121127 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0179349 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]); | [A]FR7920E (ALEXIS PIERRE BELLEMERE [FR]); | [A]GB2022193 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES) | [Y] - INTERNATIONAL LABORATORY |