EP0263563 - Time division multiplex exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/15] | Error-protected data transmission method, and circuit arrangement therefor, in a time division multiplex exchange | ||
[1994/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:ES
FR
GB
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Floiger, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Leerstetter Strasse 17 D-8500 Nürnberg 50 / DE | 02 /
Kraft, Peter Am Ursprung 3 D-8431 Sengenthal / DE | 03 /
Lamm, Andrea Am Entensee 1 D-8501 Rückersdorf / DE | 04 /
Güthaus, Roland Ostendstrasse 204 D-8500 Nürnberg30 / DE | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Peuckert, Hermann, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Peuckert, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1988/15] | Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 Postfach 10 51 49 D-2000 Hamburg 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87201903.9 | 05.10.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | DE19863633972 | 06.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3633972 | [1988/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263563 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263563 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263563 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | Zeitmultiplex-Vermittlungsanlage | [1994/04] | English: | Time division multiplex exchange | [1994/04] | French: | Central à multiplexage temporel | [1994/04] |
Former [1988/15] | Fehlergesichertes Datenübertragungsverfahren sowie Schaltungsanordnung hierfür in einer Zeitmultiplex-Vermittlungsanlage | ||
Former [1988/15] | Error-protected data transmission method, and circuit arrangement therefor, in a time division multiplex exchange | ||
Former [1988/15] | Procédé de transmission de données avec protection d'erreurs et montage de circuit pour cela, dans un central à multiplexage temporel | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 24.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.01.1994 | [1995/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2718317 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO8200232 (ROVSING AS CHRISTIAN [DK]); | [X]GB2087689 (ITALTEL SPA); | [Y]WO8301549 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [XPD]EP0219917 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) |