Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0269154
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
26.11.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
27.09.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] |
13.09.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] |
10.12.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] |
22.06.1993 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] |
14.06.1993 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] |
12.12.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] |
01.08.1991 |
First examination report |
|
01.07.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] |
25.10.1989 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] |
19.04.1989 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] |
16.04.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] |