EP0269154 - Novel olefin/CO copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drent, Eit Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/05] |
Former [1991/34] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1988/22] | Aalbers, Onno P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202086.2 | 29.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | NL19860002733 | 30.10.1986 Original published format: NL 8602733 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0269154 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0269154 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269154 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G67/02 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
C08G67/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Olefin/CO-Copolymere | [1994/04] | English: | Novel olefin/CO copolymers | [1988/22] | French: | Copolymères d'oléfines et de CO | [1988/22] |
Former [1988/22] | Olefin/CO-Kopolymere | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/04: Teilanmeldung 93201373.3 eingereicht am 29/10/87 | EPB 1994/04: Divisional application 93201373.3 filed on 29/10/87 | EPB 1994/04: Demande divisionnaire 93201373.3 déposée le 29/10/87 | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93201373.3 / EP0560463 | EP93201374.1 / EP0562698 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.1994 | GR | 26.01.1994 | SE | 26.01.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/46] | AT | 26.01.1994 | |
SE | 26.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/44] | SE | 26.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2599501 (UPSON ROBERT W); | [X]FR2213947 (RUHRCHEMIE AG [DE]); | [A]US4137382 (VETTER JR CLARENCE J); | [Y]EP0121965 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [E]EP0263564 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) | Examination | US2495286 |