EP0269156 - Universal rolling stand with rolling rings supported as cantilevers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poloni, Alfredo Via Redipuglia 155 I-34077 Ronchi Dei Legionari (GO) / IT | 02 /
Drigani, Fausto Piazza della Chiesa 6 I-33050 Zugliano (UD) / IT | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 87202097.9 | 30.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | IT19860083444 | 24.11.1986 Original published format: IT 8344486 | [1988/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269156 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269156 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/08, B21B13/12 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
B21B13/005 (EP,US);
B21B13/10 (EP,US);
B21B31/08 (EP,US);
B21B31/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | B21B31/08, B21B13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Universalwalzgerüst mit freitragenden Walzen | [1988/22] | English: | Universal rolling stand with rolling rings supported as cantilevers | [1988/22] | French: | Cage de laminoir universel à cylindres en porte-à-faux | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/02] | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1991
09.09.1991
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Gerd, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.1991
09.09.1991
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Gerd, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | 25.09.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.01.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.02.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.03.1993 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.11.1990 | GR | 14.11.1990 | LI | 14.11.1990 | NL | 14.11.1990 | SE | 14.11.1990 | LU | 31.10.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 14.11.1990 | |
LI | 14.11.1990 | ||
NL | 14.11.1990 | ||
SE | 14.11.1990 | ||
LU | 31.10.1991 | ||
Former [1991/45] | CH | 14.11.1990 | |
LI | 14.11.1990 | ||
NL | 14.11.1990 | ||
SE | 14.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/42] | CH | 14.11.1990 | |
LI | 14.11.1990 | ||
SE | 14.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 14.11.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1118724 ; | [A]US3319450 (FRED BOND HARRY LAURENCE); | [A]DE2025640 ; | [A]DE1937368 (SIEMAG SIEGENER MASCH BAU); | [A]EP0142879 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]); | [AD]DE8425635U ; | [A]US4581911 (SHINOMOTO YOSHIYUKI [JP]) | by applicant | DE8425635U |