EP0266839 - Process for concentrating a urea solution and installation for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | [1988/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonckers, Kees Illikhoven 13 NL-6116 AK Susteren / NL | 02 /
Burks, Henk Christiaan Drossaertweide 20 NL-6438 HV Schinnen / NL | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1989/09] |
Former [1988/19] | Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202109.2 | 02.11.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | NL19860002769 | 03.11.1986 Original published format: NL 8602769 | [1988/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266839 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/06, B01D1/22, F28F13/04, C07C126/08 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
C07C273/16 (EP,US);
C07C273/04 (KR);
B01D1/065 (EP,US);
F28F13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Konzentrierung einer Harnstofflösung und Anlage zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1988/19] | English: | Process for concentrating a urea solution and installation for carrying out the process | [1988/19] | French: | Procédé de concentration d'une solution d'urée et installation pour exécuter ce procédé | [1988/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 17.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/50] | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/03] | 30.08.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE908028 (HOECHST AG); | [A]FR1111540 ; | [A]US2944966 (EICKMEYER ALLEN G); | [A]FR1255949 ; | [A]US2998060 (ECKSTROM ALBERT W); | [AD]EP0145054 (UNIE VAN KUNSTMESTFAB BV [NL]) |