EP0267647 - Enciphering/deciphering method and arrangement for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansen, Cornelis Johannes Adrianus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87202133.2 | 05.11.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | NL19860002847 | 11.11.1986 Original published format: NL 8602847 | [1988/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267647 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267647 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
H04L9/0637 (EP,US);
H04L9/0656 (EP,US);
H04L9/0877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verschlüsselung/Entschlüsselung und Einrichtung zur Ausführung dieses Verfahrens | [1988/20] | English: | Enciphering/deciphering method and arrangement for performing the method | [1988/20] | French: | Procédé de chiffrage/déchiffrage et dispositif de réalisation de ce procédé | [1988/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/12] | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4157454 (BECKER WOLFRAM [DE]); | [Y]US3796830 (SMITH J); | [Y]EP0105553 (NEDERLANDEN STAAT [NL]) |