EP0267653 - Detergent composition containing ethylenediamine-N,N' disuccinic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartman, Frederik Anthony 10347 Deerfield Road Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
Perkins, Christopher Mark 6410 River Road Cincinnati Ohio 45233 / US | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 87202158.9 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | US19860929549 | 10.11.1986 Original published format: US 929549 | [1988/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267653 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267653 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0267653 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/33 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/20] | Title | German: | Äthylendiamin-N,N'-di-Bernsteinsäure enthaltendes Reinigungsmittel | [1988/20] | English: | Detergent composition containing ethylenediamine-N,N' disuccinic acid | [1988/20] | French: | Composition détergente contenant l'acide éthylènediamine N,N' disuccinique | [1988/20] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3158635 (CHARLES KEZERIAN, et al); | [A]FR2138684 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) |