EP0271129 - Line to cool wound bundles of rolled wire and rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poloni, Alfredo Via Redipuglia 155 I-34077 Ronchi dei Legionari(GO) / IT | 02 /
Nonini, Geremia Via d'Orzano 2 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | 03 /
Tomat, Ferruccio Via Colugna 135/1 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 87202177.9 | 07.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | IT19860060520U | 02.12.1986 Original published format: IT 6052086 U | [1988/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271129 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271129 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/26, B21B45/02 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
C21D9/5732 (EP,US);
B21C47/14 (EP,US);
B21C47/26 (EP,US);
B21C47/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Anlage zum Kühlen von gewickelten Bunden aus Walzdraht und Walzstab | [1988/24] | English: | Line to cool wound bundles of rolled wire and rod | [1988/24] | French: | Installation pour le refroidissement de bobines de fils et de barres laminées | [1988/24] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.01.1992 | GR | 29.01.1992 | LI | 29.01.1992 | NL | 29.01.1992 | SE | 29.01.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1992/37] | CH | 29.01.1992 | |
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 29.01.1992 | |
LI | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 29.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB1160488 (SCHLOEMANN AG [DE]); | [A]FR2344636 (MORGAARDSHAMMAR AB [SE]); | [Y]US4054276 (WILSON NORMAN A); | [YD]EP0143488 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]); | [Y]GB2158745 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [Y]EP0180254 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) |