EP0271133 - Antioxidant compositions and methods of using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAR ILAN UNIVERSITY P.O. Box 1530 IL-52100 Ramat-Gan / IL | [1988/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albeck, Michael 8, Harel Street IL-52223 Ramat Gan / IL | 02 /
Grossman, Shlomo 15, Shderot Hayeled IL-52444 Ramat Gan / IL | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Roggero, Sergio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1988/24] | Application number, filing date | 87202228.0 | 16.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | US19860932702 | 19.11.1986 Original published format: US 932702 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271133 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271133 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09K15/34, A21D2/36, A23L3/34, A61K35/70, A61K7/48 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
C09K15/34 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/3463 (EP,US);
A23L3/3472 (EP,US);
A61K36/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/47 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | Antioxidationszusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Verwendung | [1988/24] | English: | Antioxidant compositions and methods of using them | [1988/24] | French: | Composition anti-oxydante et méthodes d'utilisation | [1988/24] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 29.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1003919 [ ] (ERNST SIECKMANN); | FR2187325 [ ] (SARB [FR]); | EP0038959 [ ] (LION CORP [JP]); | GB2095553 [ ] (INTERAG RT); | EP0201956 [ ] (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL]) | [A] - H. ROQUES: "Précis de botanique pharmaceutique", vol. II, 1st May 1962, pages 215-231, Librairie Maloine, Paris, FR | Examination | - H.ROQUES, "Précis de botanique pharmaceutique", vol. II, 01 May 1962, Librairie Maloine, Paris (FR); pp. 215-231 |