EP0274150 - Single-phase synchronous motor with a bipolar permanent-magnet rotor and with an eddy current intermediate rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:ES
FR
GB
IT
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
AT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertram, Leo Am Sender 10 D-5190 Stolberg / DE | 02 /
Schemmann, Hugo, Dr. Zwartebergweg 6 NL-6371 Schaesberg / NL | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Habsburger Allee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87202376.7 | 01.12.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | DE19863641744 | 06.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3641744 | [1988/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274150 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274150 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274150 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/46, H02K7/108 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
H02K7/108 (EP,US);
H02K21/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/28] | Title | German: | Einphasensynchronmotor mit einem zweipoligen, dauermagnetischen Rotor und mit einem Wirbelstrom-Zwischenläufer | [1988/28] | English: | Single-phase synchronous motor with a bipolar permanent-magnet rotor and with an eddy current intermediate rotor | [1988/28] | French: | Moteur synchrone monophasé avec un rotor bipolaire à aimant permanent et avec un rotor intermédiaire à courants de Foucault | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 04.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.06.1992 | ES | 14.09.1992 | AT | 01.12.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.06.1992 | |
AT | 01.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 01.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1982826 (NEIN WILLIAM C, et al); | [A]US3753017 (ALTH M); | [A]FR2425751 (VALBREV SARL [FR], et al); | [A]US4388545 (HONSINGER VERNON B, et al); | [YD]DE8400013U ; | [XP]EP0246410 (IPARI MUESZERGYAR [HU]) |