EP0272755 - A method of manufacturing a semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coe, David James c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LABORATORIES Cross Oak Lane Redhill RH1 5HA / GB | 02 /
Whight, Kenneth Ronald c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LABORATORIES Cross Oak Lane Redhill RH1 5HA / GB | 03 /
Tree, Richard John c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LABORATORIES Cross Oak Lane Redhill RH1 5HA / GB | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Brian Thomas, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1995/10] |
Former [1989/05] | Clark, Jane Anne Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1988/26] | Clark, Jane Anne PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Centre Point New Oxford Street London WC1A 1QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87202561.4 | 17.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | GB19860030814 | 23.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8630814 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272755 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272755 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272755 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L29/10, H01L29/60, H01L29/78, H01L29/76 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/41766 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/26] | H01L29/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterbauelements | [1988/26] | English: | A method of manufacturing a semiconductor device | [1988/26] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un dispositif à semi-conducteur | [1988/26] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 16.03.1994 | [1995/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0067475 ; | [A]US4417385 ; | [AD]EP0054259 ; | [A]EP0164186 | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, No. 4, September 1979, pages 1464-1465 |