EP0229032 - Television receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakamada, Kunio c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Wakabayashi, Hideo c/o Patent Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300088.9 | 07.01.1987 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | JP19860001125 | 07.01.1986 Original published format: JP 112586 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229032 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229032 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229032 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/45 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
H04N5/45 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/29] | Title | German: | Fernsehempfänger | [1987/29] | English: | Television receivers | [1987/29] | French: | Récepteur de télévision | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 12.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59023682 ; | [A]JP55034511 ; | [AD]JP56027573 ; | [A]US4259690 (NAKANISHI KAORU, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 107 (E-245)[1544], 19th May 1984; & JP-A-59 023 682 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 07-02-1984, & JP59023682 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 63 (E-10)[545], 13th May 1980; & JP-A-55 034 511 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 11-03-1980, & JP55034511 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 78 (E-058)[120], 22nd May 1981; & JP-A-56 027 573 (SONY K.K.) 17-03-1981, & JP56027573 A 00000000 |