EP0232960 - Method for automatically extending the size of a segment in a page segmented virtual memory data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duvall, Keith Elliott 282 Logan Ranch Georgetown Texas 78628 / US | 02 /
Hooten, Anthony Dana 2408 Creekbend Circle Round Rock Texas 78681 / US | 03 /
O'Quin III, Johan Claude 76 Castle Road Chappaqua New York 10514 / US | 04 /
Smith, Todd Allen 1802 Apricot Glen Austin Texas 78746 / US | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1987/34] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300114.3 | 08.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19860819456 | 16.01.1986 Original published format: US 819456 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232960 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232960 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F12/14, G06F9/46 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
G06F9/52 (EP,US);
G06F12/08 (EP,US);
G06F12/145 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/34] | G06F12/14, G06F12/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Segmentlängenerweiterung in einem Datenverarbeitungssystem mit einem in Seiten aufgeteilten virtuellen Speicher | [1987/34] | English: | Method for automatically extending the size of a segment in a page segmented virtual memory data processing system | [1987/34] | French: | Méthode pour accroître automatiquement la taille d'un segment dans un système de traitement de données à mémoire virtuelle segmentée en pages | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/06] | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0115179 (IBM [US]) | [A] - THE BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL, vol. 62, no. 1, part 2, January 1983, pages 303-322; M.E. GRZELAKOWSKI et al.: "DMERT operating system" | [A] - WESCON TECHNICAL PAPERS, 30th October - 2nd November 1984, pages 1-7; K.B. WALLACE: "UNIX and the series 32000" | [A] - THE 8TH ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, Minneapolis, 12th - 14th May 1981, pages 481-493, IEEE, New York, US; W.K. GILOI et al.: "An IPC protocol and its hardware realization for a high-speed distributed multicomputer system" |