EP0234680 - Processing sensor signals from light detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans Louisiana 70160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states THE BABCOCK & WILCOX COMPANY 1010 Common Street, P.O. Box 60035 New Orleans, Louisiana 70160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, William Lee 15364 G.A.R. Highway Montville Ohio 44064 / US | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300139.0 | 08.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | US19860820769 | 21.01.1986 Original published format: US 820769 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0234680 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234680 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, G01F1/32 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
G01F1/3287 (EP,US);
G01F1/32 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Verarbeitung von Sensorsignalen von Lichtdetektoren | [1987/36] | English: | Processing sensor signals from light detectors | [1987/36] | French: | Traitement de signaux de capteurs provenant de détecteurs de lumière | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0165697 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO [US]); | [AD]GB2059699 (FISCHER & PORTER CO); | [AD]GB2116701 (ITT IND LTD) |