EP0232966 - Process for the preparation of penem compounds and intermediates for this preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/34] | Penem compounds and azetidinone intermediates for their preparation | ||
[1995/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Four New Horizons Court, Harlequin Avenue Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Four New Horizons Court, Harlequin Avenue Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Four New Horizons Court Harlequin Avenue Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coulton, Steven SmithKline Beecham plc New Frontiers Science Park Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
Harbridge, John Barry SmithKline Beecham plc New Frontiers Science Park Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 03 /
Osborne, Neal Frederick SmithKline Beecham plc New Fronties Science Park Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 04 /
Walker, Graham SmithKline Beecham plc New Frontiers Science Park Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [1997/41] |
Former [1987/34] | 01 /
Coulton, Steven Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey, RH3 7AJ / GB | ||
02 /
Harbridge, John Barry Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey, RH3 7AJ / GB | |||
03 /
Osborne, Neal Frederick Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey, RH3 7AJ / GB | |||
04 /
Walker, Graham Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey, RH3 7AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Walker, Ralph Francis, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Walker, Ralph Francis, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | ||
Former [1987/34] | Dayneswood, Trevor Beecham Pharmaceuticals Patent and Trade Mark Department Biosciences Research Centre Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom Surrey KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300193.7 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | GB19860001119 | 17.01.1986 Original published format: GB 8601119 | GB19860025017 | 18.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625017 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232966 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232966 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/00 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP);
C07D499/00 (KR);
C07D205/09 (EP);
C07D499/88 (EP);
C07F9/568 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/34] | C07D499/00, C07F9/65, C07D205/08, // C07D417/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Penem Derivaten und Zwischenprodukte zu dieser Herstellung | [1995/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of penem compounds and intermediates for this preparation | [1995/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés de pénème et intermédiaires pour cette préparation | [1995/46] |
Former [1987/34] | Penem-Verbindungen und Azetidinon-Zwischenprodukte zu ihrer Herstellung | ||
Former [1987/34] | Penem compounds and azetidinone intermediates for their preparation | ||
Former [1987/34] | Dérivés de pénème et azétidinones, intermédiaires pour leur préparation | Examination procedure | 08.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Request for further processing for: | 27.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.1997 | Decision despatched | 30.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 24.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.1997 | GR | 08.10.1997 | SE | 08.01.1998 | LU | 09.01.1998 | ES | 23.04.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 08.10.1997 | |
GR | 08.10.1997 | ||
SE | 08.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.01.1998 | ||
ES | 23.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 08.10.1997 | |
GR | 08.10.1997 | ||
SE | 08.01.1998 | ||
LU | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 08.10.1997 | |
SE | 08.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 08.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1368074 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [Y]DE2343497 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0003960 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [XP]EP0188247 (ERBA FARMITALIA [IT]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 107, no. 22, 30th October 1985, pages 6398-6399, American Chemical Society; M. ALPEGIANI et al.: "Silver-assisted 1,2-cleavage of penicillins. A three-step synthesis of optically active penems" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 4, no. 12, 1979, pages 3175-3184; P.M. DENERLEY et al.: "Alkylation of penicillanates: Aspects of the chemistry of penicillanate sulphonium salts" | Examination | GB2144743 | EP0150781 | EP0210814 |