Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0233700 | Global Dossier | 21.09.1988 | A3 | EP0233700 | 26.08.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8601166 | 17.01.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8700185 | 08.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8601166 | 17.01.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2187672 | 16.09.1987 | A | GB8700858D0 | 18.02.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8601166 | 17.01.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR870006980 | 13.08.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8601166 | 17.01.1986 |