EP0231083 - Purification of pertussis antigens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Public Health Laboratory Service Board 61 Colindale Avenue London NW9 5EQ / GB | [1987/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinson, Andrew Firdowne Gomeldon Hill Winterbourne Gunner Salisbury Wiltshire / GB | 02 /
Irons, Lawrence Ian Howstean Portland Avenue Salisbury Wiltshire / GB | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87300387.5 | 16.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | GB19860001279 | 20.01.1986 Original published format: GB 8601279 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0231083 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0231083 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231083 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/10, C07K15/00 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
C07K14/235 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61K2039/10 (KR);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S530/825 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/32] | A61K39/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Reinigung von Keuchhustenantigenen | [1987/32] | English: | Purification of pertussis antigens | [1987/32] | French: | Purification d'antigènes de coqueluche | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 15.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.1993 | GR | 04.08.1993 | NL | 04.08.1993 | SE | 04.08.1993 | ES | 15.11.1993 | LU | 31.01.1994 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
GR | 04.08.1993 | ||
NL | 04.08.1993 | ||
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
LU | 31.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 04.08.1993 | |
SE | 04.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 04.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0003916 (SECR SOCIAL SERVICE BRIT [GB]); | [A]EP0140386 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP]); | [A]EP0159003 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP]) |