Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0676501B | 28.09.1994 | B2 | JPS62280232 | 05.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0689163B | 09.11.1994 | B2 | JPS63162735 | 06.07.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0689164B | 09.11.1994 | B2 | JPS63162736 | 06.07.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS62167332 | 23.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU576981B | Global Dossier | 08.09.1988 | B2 | AU6785087 | 30.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0232060 | Global Dossier | 04.09.1991 | B1 | EP0232060 | 22.06.1988 | A3 | EP0232060 | 12.08.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1318092 | 25.05.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1006971B | 28.02.1990 | B | CN87100579 | 13.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3772582D1 | 10.10.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR910001022B | 19.02.1991 | B1 | KR870006976 | 13.08.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO173281C | 24.11.1993 | C | NO173281B | 16.08.1993 | B | NO870230L | 22.07.1987 | L | NO870230D0 | 20.01.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ218971 | 29.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4814124 | 21.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4921653 | 01.05.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12130086 | 28.05.1986 | JP888886 | 21.01.1986 | JP30872386 | 26.12.1986 | JP30872486 | 26.12.1986 |