EP0239197 - Process for producing a metallic pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagiwara Yoshichi c/o Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Cy 2501 Hudson Rd P.O. Box 33427 St.Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 02 /
Kimura Naoya c/o Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Cy 2501 Hudson Rd P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 03 /
Emori Kenji c/o Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Cy 2501 Hudson Rd P.O. Box 33427 St.Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87300771.0 | 29.01.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | JP19860018538 | 30.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1853886 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239197 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239197 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239197 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/02, C23F1/02, G03F7/00 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
C23F1/02 (EP,US);
G03F7/00 (EP,US);
H05K3/064 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0382 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09745 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines metallischen Musters | [1987/40] | English: | Process for producing a metallic pattern | [1987/40] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un patron métallique | [1987/40] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Request for further processing for: | 05.06.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8302074 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [Y]EP0163172 (IBM [US]) |